LA HB681 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
Pending: House Municipal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
Pending: House Municipal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to energy efficiency or renewable energy improvement loans (OR SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)
Title
Provides relative to energy efficiency or renewable energy improvement loans (OR SEE FISC NOTE LF EX)
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-03-01 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. | |
2012-03-01 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=12rs&billid=HB681 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=779319 |