LA HB667 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Effective date: June 17, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Effective date: June 17, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the appointment and removal of commissioners of local housing authorities located in certain parishes
Title
Provides relative to the appointment and removal of commissioners of local housing authorities located in certain parishes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 667 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#784) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 667 FINAL PASSAGE (#727) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 667 FINAL PASSAGE (#192) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 667 FINAL PASSAGE (#727) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 667 FINAL PASSAGE (#192) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | House | Effective date: June 17, 2013. |
2013-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 333. |
2013-06-05 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-03 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2013-05-30 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/03/2013. |
2013-05-29 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-04-30 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-04-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/30/2013. |
2013-04-23 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported favorably (14-0) (Local and Consent). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2013-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |