LA HB665 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date: 07/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date: 07/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the expenses of the legislature for Fiscal Year 2017-2018
Title
Makes appropriations for the expenses of the legislature for Fiscal Year 2017-2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 665 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#854) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 665 FINAL PASSAGE (#811) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 665 FINAL PASSAGE (#174) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 665 FINAL PASSAGE (#811) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 665 FINAL PASSAGE (#174) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | House | Effective date: 07/01/17. |
2017-06-22 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 78. |
2017-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2017-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/17. |
2017-06-04 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-06-04 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-04 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-01 | House | Made Special Order of the day No. 7 for 05/04/17. |
2017-05-01 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-01 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2017-04-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2017-04-19 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |