LA HB664 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-18 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-18 - Withdrawn from the files of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Infrastructure and Economic Development District in the city of New Orleans
Title
Creates the Infrastructure and Economic Development District in the city of New Orleans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | House | Withdrawn from the files of the House. |
2020-05-18 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2020-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20. |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported with amendments (13-1-1). |
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2020-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2020-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |