LA HB652 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective date: 08/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to penalties for possession of marijuana (EN DECREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to penalties for possession of marijuana (EN DECREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 652 FINAL PASSAGE (#857) (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 652 FINAL PASSAGE (#387) (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 652 AMENDMENT # 2511 BY MARCELLE MOTION TO ADOPT (#386) (Y: 71 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14HouseEffective date: 08/01/2021.
2021-06-14HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 247.
2021-06-10HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-08HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-07HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2021-06-07SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 20 yeas and 17 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-27SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-26SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-25SenateReported favorably.
2021-05-13SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2021-05-12SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-11HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 25. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-06HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2021.
2021-05-05HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-04HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-04-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB652&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212370
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220634
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223745
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232970
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235328
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220542
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222113
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222321
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212386
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219554
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1220690
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222383
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222436
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223768
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224825
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234063
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1236895
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223701
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223758
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232372

Bill Comments

feedback