LA HB65 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
Pending: House Municipal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
Pending: House Municipal Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the classified police service in the city of DeRidder
Title
Provides relative to the classified police service in the city of DeRidder
Sponsors
Rep. James Armes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2018-02-16 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/16/2018. |
2018-02-14 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2018-02-14 | House | Prefiled. |