LA HB649 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB482
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Effective date: 08/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Effective date: 08/01/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a Louisiana Music Trail and related programs (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG EX)
Title
Provides for a Louisiana Music Trail and related programs (EN SEE FISC NOTE SG EX)
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Echols [R] | Rep. Rhonda Butler [R] | Rep. Adrian Fisher [D] | Rep. Barbara Freiberg [R] |
Rep. Jack McFarland [R] | Rep. Francis Thompson [R] | Rep. Malinda White [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 649 FINAL PASSAGE (#784) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 649 FINAL PASSAGE (#462) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 649 FINAL PASSAGE (#462) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2023. |
2023-06-09 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 283. |
2023-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-06-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-06-05 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2023-05-16 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-05-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2023-05-16 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2023-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2023. |
2023-05-08 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-04 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 482 reported by the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs (12-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB482 (Replaces) 2023-05-04 - Becomes HB 649.