LA HB648 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-16 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Crime Victims Reparations Act (EN INCREASE SD EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the Crime Victims Reparations Act (EN INCREASE SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 648 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1547) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 648 FINAL PASSAGE (#1212) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 648 FINAL PASSAGE (#706) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House Vote on HB 648 JUDICIARY (#203) (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 648 FINAL PASSAGE (#1212) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 648 FINAL PASSAGE (#706) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - House Vote on HB 648 JUDICIARY (#203) (Y: 45 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 487. |
2022-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022. |
2022-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-09 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2022. |
2022-05-03 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-02 | House | Reported with amendments (16-0). |
2022-04-21 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-04-20 | House | Reported with amendments (7-0). |
2022-04-06 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2022-04-06 | House | By a vote of 45 yeas, 22 nays, House Bill 648 was discharged from the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice and recommitted to the Committee Judiciary. |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |