LA HB646 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a contract limit for public work projects by the Department of Culture, Recreation and Tourism
Title
Provides for a contract limit for public work projects by the Department of Culture, Recreation and Tourism
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - House - House Vote on HB 646 FINAL PASSAGE (#72) (Y: 80 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-03-21 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 16. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/21/2024. |
2024-03-20 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-19 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |