LA HB646 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Hearing: May 13 in Room A-B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the dedication of state lands to the Recreation and Park Commission for the Parish of East Baton Rouge (BREC)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the dedication of state lands to the Recreation and Park Commission for the Parish of East Baton Rouge (BREC)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-03 - House - House Vote on HB 646 FINAL PASSAGE (#174) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-05SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
2021-05-04SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-03HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2021.
2021-04-27HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-04-26HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2021-04-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback