LA HB64 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-07 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-07 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a program of public health and safety options for local governments to implement during a public health emergency (Item #28)
Title
Provides for a program of public health and safety options for local governments to implement during a public health emergency (Item #28)
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Ivey [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-06 - House - House Vote on HB 64 FINAL PASSAGE (#43) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2020-10-06 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-10-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/06/20. |
2020-10-05 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-10-05 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-10-05 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2020-09-30 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |