LA HB64 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the statutory authority for the La. Board of Parole (OR INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Repeals the statutory authority for the La. Board of Parole (OR INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-02-26 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/26/2010. | |
2010-02-26 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-02-26 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=10RS&billid=HB64 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=677665 |