LA HB634 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to offenses against minors
Title
Provides relative to offenses against minors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 634 FINAL PASSAGE (#451) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-26 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2022. |
2022-04-18 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-13 | House | Reported favorably (8-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2022-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |