LA HB625 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-17 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to transporters of hazardous material
Title
Provides relative to transporters of hazardous material
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 625 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1194) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 625 FINAL PASSAGE (#1030) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 625 FINAL PASSAGE (#641) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 625 FINAL PASSAGE (#1030) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House Vote on HB 625 FINAL PASSAGE (#641) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2016. |
2016-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 632. |
2016-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2016-06-02 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-06-02 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2016. |
2016-05-25 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-05-05 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-05 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2016. |
2016-05-03 | House | Notice given. |
2016-05-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2016. |
2016-04-27 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-26 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2016-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |