LA HB624 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the Commission of Weights and Measures

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the Commission of Weights and Measures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-07 - House - House Vote on HB 624 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#764) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 624 FINAL PASSAGE (#524) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House Vote on HB 624 FINAL PASSAGE (#329) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseEffective date: 08/01/2018.
2018-05-15HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 172.
2018-05-09HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-09SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-08HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-07HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in.
2018-04-27HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/07/18.
2018-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-04-25SenateRules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-19SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-18SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-17SenateReported with amendments.
2018-04-10SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2018-04-09SenateReceived in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-09HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/09/18.
2018-04-02HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-29HouseReported with amendments (12-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2018-03-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2018-03-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB624&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073035
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080740
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093701
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097984
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080588
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1079981
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087476
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090937
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1093591
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073109
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080867
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1084380
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090243

Bill Comments

feedback