LA HB62 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Becomes Act No. 445.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Becomes Act No. 445.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for appropriations from the Education Excellence Fund for certain schools (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides for appropriations from the Education Excellence Fund for certain schools (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 62 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#991) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 62 FINAL PASSAGE (#906) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 62 FINAL PASSAGE (#375) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 62 FINAL PASSAGE (#906) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 62 FINAL PASSAGE (#375) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | House | Becomes Act No. 445. |
2019-06-07 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in. |
2019-06-04 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/19. |
2019-06-04 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-16 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/19. |
2019-05-07 | House | Read by title, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported without amendments (6-0). |
2019-05-02 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2019-05-01 | House | Reported with amendments (17-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-03-15 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/15/2019. |
2019-03-13 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2019-03-13 | House | Prefiled. |