LA HB613 | 2019 | Regular Session

Note: Replaces legislation HB233

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date: 08/01/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the types of payments accepted by secondhand dealers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the types of payments accepted by secondhand dealers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on HB 613 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#915) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 613 FINAL PASSAGE (#818) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 613 FINAL PASSAGE (#478) (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11HouseEffective date: 08/01/2019.
2019-06-11HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 255.
2019-06-05HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2019-06-04SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2019-06-04HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2019-06-03HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
2019-06-02HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19.
2019-06-02HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2019-06-02SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-30SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-05-29SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2019-05-23SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
2019-05-22SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-21HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-21HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/21/19.
2019-05-15HouseNotice given.
2019-05-15HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19.
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-01HouseRead by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 233 reported by the Committee on Commerce (18-0).

Same As/Similar To

HB233 (Replaces) 2019-05-01 - Becomes HB 613.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB613&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129273
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129349
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136573
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142099
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1144121
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134366
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138853
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1139440
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141551
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1142030
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129274
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129458
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136602
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1138926
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136561
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1141111

Bill Comments

feedback