LA HB233 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Becomes HB 613.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Becomes HB 613.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the types of payments accepted by secondhand dealers
Title
Provides relative to the types of payments accepted by secondhand dealers
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Wright [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Becomes HB 613. |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported by substitute (18-0). |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2019-03-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2019-03-27 | House | Prefiled. |