LA HB610 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 45, nays 54. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 45, nays 54. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the maximum weekly benefit amount and creates a back-to-work enhancement program (OR INCREASE OF RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the maximum weekly benefit amount and creates a back-to-work enhancement program (OR INCREASE OF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 610 FINAL PASSAGE (#591) (Y: 45 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 610 FINAL PASSAGE (#591) (Y: 44 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 610 FINAL PASSAGE (#591) (Y: 44 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 45, nays 54. Failed to pass. |
2021-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2021. |
2021-05-17 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-13 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-04-02 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2021-04-02 | House | Prefiled. |