LA HB610 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Dedicates certain sales and use taxes. (EG -$6,900,000 GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dedicates certain sales and use taxes. (EG -$6,900,000 GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 610 OBJECTION (#325) (Y: 27 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - House - House Vote on HB 610 FINAL PASSAGE (#324) (Y: 44 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-15HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 44, nays 44. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
2019-05-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19.
2019-05-02HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-01HouseReported with amendments (16-0).
2019-04-22HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2019-04-17HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB610&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125579
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129500
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129007
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129043
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129846
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130892
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1125580
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1127917
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1130100
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1133984
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134693
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134696

Bill Comments

feedback