LA HB610 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 36, nays 50. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 36, nays 50. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extends public records exemption to all practitioners licensed by the La. State Board of Medical Examiners
Title
Extends public records exemption to all practitioners licensed by the La. State Board of Medical Examiners
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Katz [R] |
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 610, FINAL PASSAGE (#304) (Y: 36 N: 50 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 36, nays 50. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-04-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 21, 2010. | |
2010-04-15 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-14 | Reported favorably (11-3) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-16 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-03-16 | Prefiled. |