LA HB602 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Effective date: 06/09/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Effective date: 06/09/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to notary exam and study material fees
Title
Provides relative to notary exam and study material fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 602 FINAL PASSAGE (#1064) (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 602 AMENDMENT # 2821 BY CLAITOR HB 602 BY SHADOIN (#1063) (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 602 FINAL PASSAGE (#384) (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 602 AMENDMENT # 2821 BY CLAITOR HB 602 BY SHADOIN (#1063) (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2016-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 602 FINAL PASSAGE (#384) (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | House | Effective date: 06/09/2016. |
2016-06-09 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 438. |
2016-05-31 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-26 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-25 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 24 yeas and 13 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-04-19 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 77, nays 18. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/19/2016. |
2016-04-13 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-12 | House | Reported with amendments (7-0-1). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2016-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |