LA HB602 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-20 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-20 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to assessments for licensure as a real estate appraisal management company (EN +$171,000 SG RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to assessments for licensure as a real estate appraisal management company (EN +$171,000 SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - House - House Vote on HB 602, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#584) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 602, FINAL PASSAGE (#418) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 602, FINAL PASSAGE (#193) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 602, FINAL PASSAGE (#418) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 602, FINAL PASSAGE (#193) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-20 | Effective date: August 15, 2011. | |
2011-06-20 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 114. | |
2011-06-15 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-06-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-15 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-14 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 1. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in. | |
2011-06-13 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/14/2011. | |
2011-06-08 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2011-06-08 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-05-31 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-05-26 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-05-25 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2011-05-18 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | |
2011-05-17 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2011-05-17 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/17/2011. | |
2011-05-11 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-05-10 | Reported with amendments (16-0) (Regular). | |
2011-05-03 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2011-05-02 | Read by title. |