LA HB6 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-29 - Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-29 - Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that sentences for the crime of aggravated second degree battery shall not be suspended (OR INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides that sentences for the crime of aggravated second degree battery shall not be suspended (OR INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2010-04-28 | Reported favorably (14-0), with the recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-02-05 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/5/2010. | |
2010-01-29 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-01-29 | Prefiled. |