LA HB597 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-21 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to prohibition on certain governmental entity contracts with companies that discriminate against firearm and ammunition industries (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to prohibition on certain governmental entity contracts with companies that discriminate against firearm and ammunition industries (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 597 ADOPT (#1102) (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Vote on HB 597 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1235) (Y: 79 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 597 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1132) (Y: 71 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 597 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1132) (Y: 70 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 597 FINAL PASSAGE (#934) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 597 FINAL PASSAGE (#612) (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-21HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-07-20HouseVeto message read. Lies over under the rules.
2021-07-01HouseVetoed by the Governor.
2021-06-11HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2021-06-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
2021-06-10HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-10HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2021-06-10SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 25 yeas and 8 nays.
2021-06-10SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2021-06-10HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 79, nays 22. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2021-06-10HouseRules suspended.
2021-06-10HouseConference Committee report received.
2021-06-09SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: White, Boudreaux, and Henry.
2021-06-09HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2021-06-09SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2021-06-08HouseHouse conferees appointed: Miguez, Zeringue, and Deshotel.
2021-06-08SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2021-06-08HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 71, nays 17, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2021-06-07HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021.
2021-06-07HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2021-06-07SenateRules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-06-06SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-06-06SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-25SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2021-05-24SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-20HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 72, nays 19. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-20HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-18HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2021.
2021-05-18HouseNotice given.
2021-05-17HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-13HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2021.
2021-05-11HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-10HouseReported with amendments (16-5).
2021-04-12HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2021-04-02HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
2021-04-02HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2021-04-02HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=HB597&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212154
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222850
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234593
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226951
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222763
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222401
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212487
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223073
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226193
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232480
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212166
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222408
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223045
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225086
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227034
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229830
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233094
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234309
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235029
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1236629
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226923
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232801
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233480
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233635
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234450
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234509

Bill Comments

feedback