LA HB592 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-30 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
Pending: Senate Labor & Industrial Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the creation of a workers' compensation pharmacy formulary

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the creation of a workers' compensation pharmacy formulary

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - House - House Vote on HB 592 FINAL PASSAGE (#418) (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
2017-05-24SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2017-05-23HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 58, nays 36. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2017-05-23HouseCalled from the calendar.
2017-05-18HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/23/17.
2017-05-18HouseNotice given.
2017-05-18HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2017-05-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/18/17.
2017-05-15HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2017-05-11HouseReported with amendments (8-5).
2017-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
2017-03-31HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
2017-03-31HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=17rs&b=HB592&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1031487
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040969
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044454
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1031747
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1039554
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040822
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1040940
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041768
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1042761
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1031513
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1041136
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044470
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1044395

Bill Comments

feedback