LA HB590 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-08 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to prior bad acts in domestic violence and cruelty to juveniles cases
Title
Provides with respect to prior bad acts in domestic violence and cruelty to juveniles cases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 590 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1134) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 590 FINAL PASSAGE (#925) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House Vote on HB 590 FINAL PASSAGE (#109) (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 590 FINAL PASSAGE (#925) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - House - House Vote on HB 590 FINAL PASSAGE (#109) (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2016. |
2016-06-08 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 399. |
2016-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-06-02 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-01 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2016-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2016. |
2016-05-24 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-03-31 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-03-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/31/2016. |
2016-03-24 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2016-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. |
2016-03-04 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2016-03-04 | House | Prefiled. |