LA HB580 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-23 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-23 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the disposition of timber severance taxes (RE NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the disposition of timber severance taxes (RE NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 580 FINAL PASSAGE (#363) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-18 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/17. |
2017-05-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-11 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |