LA HB572 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Fatherhood First Initiative (RE +$49,900 FF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to the Fatherhood First Initiative (RE +$49,900 FF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 572 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#832) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 572 FINAL PASSAGE (#844) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 572 FINAL PASSAGE (#318) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 572 FINAL PASSAGE (#844) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 572 FINAL PASSAGE (#318) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2013. |
2013-06-17 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 322. |
2013-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/4/2013. |
2013-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-08 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/8/2013. |
2013-05-01 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2013-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |