LA HB571 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Effective date: 06/14/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - Effective date: 06/14/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to carbon capture and sequestration (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV)
Title
Provides relative to carbon capture and sequestration (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 571 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1247) (Y: 83 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 571 ADOPT (#1040) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 571 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1041) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 571 FINAL PASSAGE (#618) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 571 FINAL PASSAGE (#323) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 571 AMENDMENT # 2803 BY CORMIER MOTION TO ADOPT (#322) (Y: 9 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 571 AMENDMENT # 2624 BY MCCORMICK MOTION TO ADOPT (#321) (Y: 17 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 571 AMENDMENT # 2633 BY MCCORMICK MOTION TO ADOPT (#320) (Y: 17 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 571 AMENDMENT # 2790 BY CARTER R. MOTION TO ADOPT (#319) (Y: 26 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 571 AMENDMENT # 2766 BY CARTER R. MOTION TO ADOPT (#318) (Y: 15 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 571 AMENDMENT # 2764 BY CARTER R. MOTION TO ADOPT (#317) (Y: 18 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 571 5 MINUTE RULE (#316) (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 571 3 MINUTE RULE (#315) (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 571 ADOPT (#1040) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 571 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1041) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 571 FINAL PASSAGE (#618) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 571 FINAL PASSAGE (#323) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 571 AMENDMENT # 2803 BY CORMIER MOTION TO ADOPT (#322) (Y: 9 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 571 AMENDMENT # 2624 BY MCCORMICK MOTION TO ADOPT (#321) (Y: 17 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 571 AMENDMENT # 2633 BY MCCORMICK MOTION TO ADOPT (#320) (Y: 17 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 571 AMENDMENT # 2790 BY CARTER R. MOTION TO ADOPT (#319) (Y: 26 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 571 AMENDMENT # 2766 BY CARTER R. MOTION TO ADOPT (#318) (Y: 15 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 571 AMENDMENT # 2764 BY CARTER R. MOTION TO ADOPT (#317) (Y: 18 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 571 5 MINUTE RULE (#316) (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 571 3 MINUTE RULE (#315) (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-14 | House | Effective date: 06/14/2023. |
2023-06-14 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 378. |
2023-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/2023. |
2023-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2023-06-08 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2023-06-08 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 83, nays 9. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2023-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2023-06-08 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Notice of change in House Conference Committee membership. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2023-06-07 | House | Notice of change in House conferees: Schexnayder,Coussan, Riser. |
2023-06-07 | House | House conferees appointed: Schexnayder, Coussan, and Bourriaque. |
2023-06-07 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Hensgens, Fesi, and Lambert. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2023-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2023-06-04 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/2023. |
2023-06-04 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2023-05-11 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-05-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2023. |
2023-05-02 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-01 | House | Reported with amendments (19-0). |
2023-04-24 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2023-04-03 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. |
2023-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2023-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |