LA HB57 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 56-7-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Effective date: 01/01/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Enacts the Civil Justice Reform Act of 2020 (Item #40)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the Civil Justice Reform Act of 2020 (Item #40)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-30 - House - House Vote on HB 57 MOTION TO ADOPT (#184) (Y: 86 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 57 ADOPT (#182) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - House - House Vote on HB 57 RECOMMIT TO THE CONFERENCE COMMITTEE (#180) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 57 ADOPT (#164) (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote on HB 57 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#101) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 57 FINAL PASSAGE (#83) (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 57 AMENDMENT # 328 BY FIELDS HB 57 BY MR. SPEAKER (#82) (Y: 14 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 57 RETURN CAL - SUBJ TO CALL (#81) (Y: 11 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 57 AMENDMENT # 325 BY PEACOCK Object ruling (#80) (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House Vote on HB 57 FINAL PASSAGE (#35) (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-13HouseEffective date: 01/01/2021.
2020-07-13HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 37.
2020-07-01HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2020-06-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-30HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-30HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-30SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 4 nays.
2020-06-30SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-30HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 86, nays 15. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2020-06-30HouseRules suspended.
2020-06-30HouseConference Committee report received.
2020-06-30HouseHouse conferees appointed: Schexnayder, Gregory Miller, and Stefanski.
2020-06-30SenateNotice House recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
2020-06-30HouseThe House recommitted the bill to Conference Committee by a vote of 95 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-06-30SenateThe Senate recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
2020-06-30SenateReconsidered.
2020-06-30SenateRules suspended.
2020-06-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/30/20.
2020-06-29HouseConference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
2020-06-29HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2020-06-29SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 8 nays.
2020-06-29SenateRules suspended.
2020-06-28HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2020-06-24SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Cortez, Peacock, and Luneau.
2020-06-24SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2020-06-24SenateNotice House rejected the Senate amendments.
2020-06-24HouseHouse conferees appointed: Schexnayder, Gregory Miller, and Stefanski.
2020-06-24HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2020-06-23HouseScheduled for concurrence on 06/24/20.
2020-06-23HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2020-06-22SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 9 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-06-19SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-06-18SenateCommittee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-06-17SenateReported with amendments.
2020-06-15SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
2020-06-15HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 22. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2020-06-10HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/15/20.
2020-06-10HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-06-09HouseReported with amendments (10-0-1).
2020-06-08HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=201ES&b=HB57&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180636
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180893
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182250
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185162
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1186090
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180659
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180859
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181072
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181270
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181735
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182485
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182686
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183316
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183290
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183318
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183312
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183509
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183777
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1180637
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1181025
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182284
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182786
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184956
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185095
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1186575
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1182235
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183317
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1183322
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1184961
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185096
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185134
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1185135

Bill Comments

feedback