LA HB57 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates funds for payment of judgment against the State in the matter of "John Britton, Peggy Britton Anthony and Tiffany Bourgeois, Individually and on behalf of Dallin Bourgeois v. Kenneth Vallone, Omega Natchiq, Inc., National Union Fire Ins. Co. of Pittsburgh, Lexington Ins. Co. and State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins. Co."
Title
Appropriates funds for payment of judgment against the State in the matter of "John Britton, Peggy Britton Anthony and Tiffany Bourgeois, Individually and on behalf of Dallin Bourgeois v. Kenneth Vallone, Omega Natchiq, Inc., National Union Fire Ins. Co. of Pittsburgh, Lexington Ins. Co. and State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins. Co."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2014-01-27 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/27/2014. |
2014-01-23 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2014-01-23 | House | Prefiled. |