LA HB569 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-25 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 39, nays 56. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-25 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 39, nays 56. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to homeowners' insurance
Title
Provides relative to homeowners' insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - House - House Vote on HB 569 FINAL PASSAGE (#687) (Y: 39 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 39, nays 56. Failed to pass. |
2023-05-25 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2023-05-25 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2023-05-25 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2023-05-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2023. |
2023-05-24 | House | Notice given. |
2023-05-24 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2023-05-24 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2023-05-24 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2023-05-24 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2023-05-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2023. |
2023-05-18 | House | Notice given. |
2023-05-18 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2023-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2023. |
2023-05-11 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-10 | House | Reported with amendments (6-4). |
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2023-04-03 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. |
2023-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2023-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |