LA HB569 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective date: July 1, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the Harbor Police Retirement System for the port of New Orleans, makes comprehensive changes to the provisions of such system (EN INCREASE APV)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the Harbor Police Retirement System for the port of New Orleans, makes comprehensive changes to the provisions of such system (EN INCREASE APV)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 569, ADOPT (#1029) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - House Vote on HB 569, MOTION TO ADOPT (#934) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - House - House Vote on HB 569, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#848) (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 569, FINAL PASSAGE (#831) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - House Vote on HB 569, FINAL PASSAGE (#513) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-07-01 Effective date: July 1, 2011.
2011-07-01 Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 399.
2011-06-24 Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
2011-06-23 Signed by the President of the Senate on June 24.
2011-06-23 Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2011-06-23 Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2011-06-23 Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
2011-06-23 Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2011-06-23 Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2011-06-22 Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
2011-06-22 Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2011-06-22 Senate conference committee members appointed: Gautreaux, Appel, and Nevers.
2011-06-21 House conferees appointed: Arnold, Pearson, and Henderson.
2011-06-21 Notice House rejected Senate amendments.
2011-06-21 Read by title, roll called, yeas 87, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
2011-06-20 Scheduled for concurrence on 6/21/2011.
2011-06-20 Received from the Senate with amendments.
2011-06-20 Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2011-06-20 Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2011-06-20 Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2011-06-19 Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2011-06-13 Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2011-06-09 Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2011-06-08 Scheduled for floor debate on 6/9/2011.
2011-06-08 Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2011-06-07 Reported with amendments (9-0) (Regular).
2011-04-25 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2011-04-18 First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011.
2011-04-15 Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
2011-04-15 Prefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=11RS&billid=HB569
Texthttp://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=742277
Texthttp://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=753190
Texthttp://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=754122
Texthttp://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=759723
Texthttp://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=760904
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=754064
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=757948
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=758468
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=759411
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=759536

Bill Comments

feedback