LA HB556 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-02 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amends firearm-free zone provisions with respect to concealed handgun permit holders
Title
Amends firearm-free zone provisions with respect to concealed handgun permit holders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on HB 556, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1636) (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 556, FINAL PASSAGE (#1534) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 556, FINAL PASSAGE (#644) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 556, FINAL PASSAGE (#1534) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 556, FINAL PASSAGE (#644) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-02 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-07-02 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 925. | |
2010-06-18 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-17 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-16 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 3, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2010-06-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/16/2010. | |
2010-06-14 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2010-06-14 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-05-27 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-05-26 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-25 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-05-11 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | |
2010-05-10 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-05-06 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-29 | Scheduled for floor debate on May 6, 2010. | |
2010-04-29 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-28 | Reported favorably (8-3-1) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-16 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2010-03-16 | Prefiled. |