LA HB54 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: House Transportation, Highways and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: House Transportation, Highways and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redesignates a portion of United States Highway 171 in Shreveport as the "Elbert W. 'Eddie' Giles Memorial Highway"
Title
Redesignates a portion of United States Highway 171 in Shreveport as the "Elbert W. 'Eddie' Giles Memorial Highway"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2020-02-14 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/14/2020. |
2020-02-12 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2020-02-12 | House | Prefiled. |