LA HB522 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the length of time relative to the utilization of design-build contracts (EN SEE FISC NOTE See Note)
Title
Extends the length of time relative to the utilization of design-build contracts (EN SEE FISC NOTE See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 522, FINAL PASSAGE (#1971) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 522, AFTER 82D DAY (#1848) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 522, 2/3 (#1912) (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 522, FINAL PASSAGE (#1760) (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on HB 522, FINAL PASSAGE (#278) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 522, AFTER 82D DAY (#1848) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 522, 2/3 (#1912) (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 522, FINAL PASSAGE (#1760) (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - House Vote on HB 522, FINAL PASSAGE (#278) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 819. | |
2010-06-23 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-21 | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/23. | |
2010-06-21 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-20 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-20 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 22 yeas and 12 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-20 | Rules suspended. Called from the calendar. | |
2010-06-20 | Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day. | |
2010-06-20 | By a vote of 94 yeas, 0 nays the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day. | |
2010-06-18 | Notice Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day. | |
2010-06-18 | Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 29 yeas and 2 nays. | |
2010-06-18 | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2010-06-17 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | |
2010-06-17 | Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 18 yeas and 13 nays. | |
2010-06-17 | Rules suspended | |
2010-06-14 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-11 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-10 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2010-04-20 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. | |
2010-04-20 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-15 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 20, 2010. | |
2010-04-14 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-04-13 | Reported with amendments (16-0) (Regular). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2010-03-15 | Prefiled. |