LA HB518 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Effective date: 05/16/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Effective date: 05/16/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the transfer of certain state property in St. Martin Parish
Title
Provides for the transfer of certain state property in St. Martin Parish
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Huval [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 518 FINAL PASSAGE (#755) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House Vote on HB 518 FINAL PASSAGE (#161) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House Vote on HB 518 FINAL PASSAGE (#161) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | Effective date: 05/16/2014. |
2014-05-16 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 73. |
2014-05-12 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-07 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-03-31 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-03-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/31/2014. |
2014-03-20 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2014-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2014-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |