LA HB516 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates funds for payment of judgment in the matter of "Bridget Bourgeois, et al v. State of La. DOTD, et al" consolidated with "Tim Green v. State Farm Mutual Insurance Company, et al" consolidated with "Johnathan Louis and Manya Louis v. State of La. DOTD"
Title
Appropriates funds for payment of judgment in the matter of "Bridget Bourgeois, et al v. State of La. DOTD, et al" consolidated with "Tim Green v. State Farm Mutual Insurance Company, et al" consolidated with "Johnathan Louis and Manya Louis v. State of La. DOTD"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-02-29 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | |
2012-02-29 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=12rs&billid=HB516 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=777465 |