LA HB515 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Effective date: 08/01/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to succession involving limited liability company
Title
Provides relative to succession involving limited liability company
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 515 FINAL PASSAGE (#676) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 515 FINAL PASSAGE (#150) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 515 FINAL PASSAGE (#150) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2022. |
2022-05-25 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 156. |
2022-05-20 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-18 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-17 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-15 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-04 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-03-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2022. |
2022-03-29 | House | Notice given. |
2022-03-29 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-03-29 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-03-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/29/2022. |
2022-03-24 | House | Notice given. |
2022-03-21 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-03-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/21/2022. |
2022-03-16 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-03-15 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2022-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |