LA HB513 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals the marijuana tax levied on certain dealers and repeals provisions related to tax stamps which evidence payment of the tax (EG NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals the marijuana tax levied on certain dealers and repeals provisions related to tax stamps which evidence payment of the tax (EG NO IMPACT GF RV See Note)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-29HouseNotice removed
2019-05-28HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19.
2019-05-28HouseNotice given.
2019-05-28HouseNotice removed
2019-05-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/28/19.
2019-05-22HouseNotice given.
2019-05-22HouseNotice removed
2019-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
2019-05-20HouseNotice given.
2019-05-20HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-07HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19.
2019-05-07HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-05-06HouseReported with amendments (11-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback