LA HB512 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the notification of administrative sanctions form from being introduced as evidence
Title
Prohibits the notification of administrative sanctions form from being introduced as evidence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 512, FINAL PASSAGE (#972) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 512, FINAL PASSAGE (#585) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - House Vote on HB 512, FINAL PASSAGE (#585) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | Effective date: August 1, 2012. | |
2012-05-17 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 158. | |
2012-05-16 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2012-05-16 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-15 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-15 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2012-05-14 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-10 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-09 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-08 | Reported favorably. | |
2012-05-01 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | |
2012-04-30 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-04-30 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-04-23 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/30/2012. | |
2012-04-19 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-18 | Reported with amendments (11-0) (Regular). | |
2012-03-20 | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2012-03-19 | Reported without action, (14-0) with recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2012-03-12 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2012-03-03 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/2/2012. | |
2012-02-29 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2012-02-29 | Prefiled. |