LA HB510 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective date: 08/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Designates a portion of Highway 1 in Alexandria as the "Deputy Marshal Glen Denning DeVanie Memorial Highway"
Title
Designates a portion of Highway 1 in Alexandria as the "Deputy Marshal Glen Denning DeVanie Memorial Highway"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - House - House Vote on HB 510 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#547) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 510 FINAL PASSAGE (#388) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 510 FINAL PASSAGE (#119) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 510 FINAL PASSAGE (#388) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 510 FINAL PASSAGE (#119) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | House | Effective date: 08/01/17. |
2017-06-12 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 155. |
2017-06-02 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-01 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-05-31 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/17. |
2017-05-18 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-02 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-04-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/17. |
2017-04-25 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-04-24 | House | Reported favorably (18-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |