LA HB504 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for additional court costs for the New Orleans Municipal Court (EN +$25,000 LF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for additional court costs for the New Orleans Municipal Court (EN +$25,000 LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 504 FINAL PASSAGE (#588) (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - House Vote on HB 504 FINAL PASSAGE (#262) (Y: 76 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - House - House Vote on HB 504 FINAL PASSAGE (#262) (Y: 76 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2013. |
2013-06-10 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 199. |
2013-05-30 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-28 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-28 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-06 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 4. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-04-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/6/2013. |
2013-04-30 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. |
2013-04-29 | House | Reported favorably (11-0) (Local and Consent). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2013-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |