LA HB496 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Unclaimed Property Revolving Loan Commission to provide financial assistance to local governments and political subdivisions for certain capital infrastructure projects (RE INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Unclaimed Property Revolving Loan Commission to provide financial assistance to local governments and political subdivisions for certain capital infrastructure projects (RE INCREASE SG EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 496 FINAL PASSAGE (#379) (Y: 73 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
2019-05-20SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2019-05-16HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 21. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2019-05-16HouseCalled from the calendar.
2019-05-15HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/16/19.
2019-05-15HouseNotice given.
2019-05-15HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2019-05-07HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19.
2019-04-30HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2019-04-29HouseReported with amendments (15-0).
2019-04-08HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-29HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-29HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=19rs&b=HB496&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122087
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128822
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135115
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128152
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128345
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129393
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1134249
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1122098
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128178
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1128856
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1129491
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135169
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1136053
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1135150

Bill Comments

feedback