LA HB494 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Effective date: 01/01/2025.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Effective date: 01/01/2025.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to special identification cards for children
Title
Provides relative to special identification cards for children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-29 - House - House Vote on HB 494 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1497) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 494 FINAL PASSAGE (#868) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House Vote on HB 494 FINAL PASSAGE (#73) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 494 FINAL PASSAGE (#868) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House Vote on HB 494 FINAL PASSAGE (#73) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-10 | House | Effective date: 01/01/2025. |
2024-06-10 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 563. |
2024-06-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-30 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-29 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 85, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2024-05-22 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/29/2024. |
2024-05-20 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-03-21 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 101, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-21 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-03-21 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-03-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/21/2024. |
2024-03-20 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-19 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |