LA HB490 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-17 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-17 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes for a specified period of time a maximum dollar amount for a TOPS award (OR -$13,000,000 GF EX See Note)
Title
Establishes for a specified period of time a maximum dollar amount for a TOPS award (OR -$13,000,000 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-17 | Involuntarily deferred in committee. | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-15 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-03-15 | Prefiled. |
Subjects
Louisiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/byinst.asp?sessionid=10RS&billid=HB490 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.la.us/billdata/streamdocument.asp?did=684264 |