LA HB476 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: House House and Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: House House and Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Places the Department of Economic Development within the office of the lieutenant governor (OR SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Places the Department of Economic Development within the office of the lieutenant governor (OR SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Wright [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-03-04 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. |
2022-03-03 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-03-03 | House | Prefiled. |