LA HB473 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date: 06/16/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date: 06/16/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to P.O.S.T. certification of peace officers
Title
Provides relative to P.O.S.T. certification of peace officers
Sponsors
Rep. Randal Gaines [D] | Rep. John Bagneris [D] | Sen. Gary Carter [D] | Sen. Jimmy Harris [D] |
Sen. Katrina Jackson-Andrews [D] | Rep. Edward James [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 473 ADOPT (#952) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 473 MOTION TO ADOPT (#928) (Y: 71 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2017-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 473 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#703) (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 473 FINAL PASSAGE (#541) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 473 FINAL PASSAGE (#237) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 473 MOTION TO ADOPT (#928) (Y: 71 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2017-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 473 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#703) (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 473 FINAL PASSAGE (#541) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Vote on HB 473 FINAL PASSAGE (#237) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | House | Effective date: 06/16/17. |
2017-06-16 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 271. |
2017-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/2017. |
2017-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-08 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-08 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 71, nays 11. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2017-06-07 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/08/17. |
2017-06-07 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2017-06-05 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Gary Smith, Peacock, and White. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2017-06-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Gaines, Jackson, and Terry Landry. |
2017-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 5, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2017-06-01 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/04/17. |
2017-05-30 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2017-05-09 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-05-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/17. |
2017-05-01 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |