LA HB470 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Coroner's Operational Fund for St. Mary Parish
Title
Provides relative to the Coroner's Operational Fund for St. Mary Parish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - House Vote on HB 470 FINAL PASSAGE (#447) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-11 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/11/2024. |
2024-04-09 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-08 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2024-02-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2024-02-29 | House | Prefiled. |